Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a candidate to seek an immediate injunction against certain violations of the campaign finance laws against a certain campaign finance entity supporting the candidacy of any candidate for the same office.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0260
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1265 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {874430/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {874430/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Ways and Means 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page