Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Delivery of Notices and Other Communications by Electronic Means
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to send certain notices and communications by electronic means under certain circumstances; authorizing, under certain circumstances, a person to send to the Commissioner certain notices and communications by electronic means approved by the Commissioner; and providing, subject to certain provisions of law, that certain notices and communications are to be presumed to have been received in the ordinary course.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/29/2020
Legislative Date
9/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 9/29/2020 9/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Maryland Insurance Administration - Delivery of Notices and Other Communications by Electronic Means
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page