Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Medical Laboratories - Advertising for or Soliciting Business - Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a prohibition on specified advertising for or soliciting business in the State for a medical laboratory.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/20/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM