Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Use of Handgun in Crime of Violence or Felony - Statute of Limitations
Sponsored by
Senators Frosh, Montgomery, Raskin, and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who violates a specified provision of law prohibiting using a firearm in the commission of a crime of violence or felony is not covered by the 1-year statute of limitations for a misdemeanor; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0575
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed 43
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 First Reading Judiciary 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM