Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Astle, Bates, Cassilly, Conway, Eckardt, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Muse, Norman, Peters, Ready, Rosapepe, Serafini, Simonaire, Young, Zucker, Smith, and McFadden
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that a jackpot won at a video lottery terminal that is not claimed by the winner within 182 days after the jackpot is won shall become the property of the State and be distributed in a specified manner.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1108 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {609834/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-4)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {609834/1 Adopted 28
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Ways and Means 33
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-4) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Text - Chapter - Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM