Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings - Alterations (Green Building Restoration Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "high performance building" to include certain schools and public safety buildings; altering the application of certain high performance building requirements to apply to capital projects for which more than 25% of the funding for the acquisition, construction, or renovation of the project is from State funds; repealing a requirement that the Maryland Green Building Council develop guidelines for new public school buildings to achieve a certain rating without requiring a certain certification; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0086
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings - Alterations (Green Building Restoration Act)
Last Updated: 1/23/2021 9:31 PM
Click to return on the top page