Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Condominiums - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit - Limitation on Fees
Sponsored by
Senator Frosh
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Limiting the amount of the fee that a condominium council of unit owners may charge a unit owner to the lesser of either $100 or the actual cost to furnish a certificate with the information necessary for the unit owner to comply with specified resale disclosure requirements; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0412
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378473/1
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Mathias) Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378473/1
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/20 (Senator Mathias) Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378473/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {320414/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-4)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senators Frosh, Gladden, and Muse
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Delegates Beidle, McMillan, and Norman
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments {378473/1 27
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 Laid Over (Senator Mathias) Adopted 27
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {378473/1 28
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Special Order until 2/20 (Senator Mathias) Adopted 28
Senate 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments {378473/1 Report Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 32
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 35
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {320414/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-4) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Requests House Recede 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senators Frosh, Gladden, and Muse 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 House Refuses to Recede 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Delegates Beidle, McMillan, and Norman 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-135 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM