Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Elfreth, Ellis, Hayes, Kagan, Lam, McCray, Patterson, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding to all counties in the State a prohibition on State agencies constructing within the nine Eastern Shore counties a toll road, toll highway, or toll bridge without the consent of a majority of the affected counties.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0292
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0442 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:55 PM