Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund – Extension and Program Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher and Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a pretrial services program that receives a certain grant from charging a fee to a defendant for participation in the program; and extending the termination date of the Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund to June 30, 2028.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0126
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0679 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/22/2020
Legislative Date
10/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 10/22/2020 10/22/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Public Safety – Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund – Extension and Program Requirements
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/22/2021 4:24 PM
Click to return on the top page