Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Port Administration - Land Acquisition and Payment to Counties
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing, from 90 to 30, the number of days that political subdivisions have to respond to a request by the Maryland Port Administration to acquire property in the political subdivision before approval is deemed given; limiting the number of years to 3 that the Administration and a county may agree to the Administration paying the county a stated sum in place of certain taxes or assessments or voluntary contributions; repealing a requirement that Anne Arundel County hold a certain public hearing; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Port Administration - Land Acquisition and Payment to Counties
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/20/2021 1:32 PM
Click to return on the top page