Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Benson, Conway, Feldman, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Robinson, Smith, and Zucker
Status
Veto sustained (0-44)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that a student's absence from school due to the student's pregnancy or parenting needs is a lawful absence; requiring each county board of education to develop a written attendance policy for pregnant and parenting students that, at a minimum, excuses specified absences under specified circumstances and provides at least 10 days of excused absences after the birth of a parenting student's child; requiring each county board to publish its written attendance policy for pregnant and parenting students on the board's Web site; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0616
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {804934/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {855560/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-18)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-44)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {804934/1 Adopted 22
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22
Text - Third - Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Ways and Means 26
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {855560/1 Adopted 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (122-18) 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Veto sustained (0-44)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-301.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM