Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
Veto sustained (0-44)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring the Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers from the State Department of Education to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; requiring the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission to provide staff support for the Council; authorizing the Commission to seek the assistance of organizations with expertise in school-based health care or specified other matters to provide additional staffing resources to the Commission and the Council; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0221
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-44)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Text - First - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31
Text - Third - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 33
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 36
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Veto sustained (0-44)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-4A-01 through 7-4A-05 )
(   19-22A-01, 19-22A-01 through 19-22A-05, 19-22A-02, 19-22A-03, 19-22A-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM