Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Benson, Carter, Hayes, Lee, McCray, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Smith, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, from refusing to underwrite, canceling, refusing to renew, rating a risk, or increasing a renewal premium based, in whole or in part, on the occupation of, or on the education level attained by, the insured or applicant.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0329
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0945 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM