Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Establishment of a Consumer Affairs Satellite Office in Prince George's County
Sponsored by
Senators Currie, Benson, Miller, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, and Ramirez
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of the Attorney General to establish a consumer affairs satellite office located in Prince George's County; providing for the purpose of establishing a consumer affairs satellite office; requiring the consumer affairs satellite office to provide consumers with specified resources; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to give specified consideration when determining the location of the consumer affairs satellite office; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/21/2013 1/21/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2013 2/21/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 31
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Second Reading Passed 31
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 33
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 36
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM