Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Reports to Crimesolvers/Crimestoppers Organization - Inadmissibility and Confidentiality
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that evidence of a communication or information contained in the communication between an individual reporting alleged criminal activity to a specified Crimesolvers/Crimestoppers organization and the individual who accepts the report is not admissible in a court proceeding; establishing that a law enforcement agency that receives specified information may not disclose the identity of the individual who provided the information under a promise of anonymity; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0169 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/17/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1101 through 11-1103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM