Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Major Information Technology Development Project Fund – Use of Funds
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Information Technology)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that certain money paid into the Major Information Technology Development Fund shall be used to support a certain State telecommunication and computer network and the Statewide Public Safety Interoperability Radio System; and authorizing the Secretary of Information Technology to determine the portion of certain funds that may be allocated to each program.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Major Information Technology Development Project Fund – Use of Funds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Major Information Technology Development Project Fund – Use of Funds
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/27/2021 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page