Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protections for Interns
Sponsored by
Senators King, Raskin, Ramirez, Colburn, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Forehand, Jones-Rodwell, Kasemeyer, Kelley, Madaleno, Manno, Miller, Montgomery, Peters, Pugh, Robey, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that an intern is considered to be in an employment relationship with an employer for the purposes of specified protections from specified discriminatory acts, access to a specified complaint resolution procedure, and specified administrative remedies; providing that the Act does not create an employment relationship between an employer and an intern for the purposes of specified provisions of law; establishing the exclusive remedies for specified discriminatory acts; defining the term "intern"; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0381
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1001, 20-1003.1, 20-601, 20-606, 20-610 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM