Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland - Pay It Forward Pilot Program and Tuition Freeze - Studies
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Feldman, King, Manno, Montgomery, Raskin, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to study the creation of a potential Pay It Forward Pilot Program; requiring the study to consider specified items; requiring the Board of Regents to study whether public institutions of higher education could successfully implement specified tuition freeze programs; providing for the termination of the Act; and requiring the Board of Regents to report its findings and recommendations on the potential programs on or before December 31, 2015.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0057
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0626 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM