Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver's Licenses - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Carter, Smith, and Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the penalties for a person convicted for possession of a canceled, revoked, or suspended driver's license to be a fine not exceeding $500 and an assessment of 3 points.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0076
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-9)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver's Licenses - Penalties
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed 39
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver's Licenses - Penalties
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 43
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (126-9) 56
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver's Licenses - Penalties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-301, 16-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM