Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Reform
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that the Police Department of Baltimore City is an agency and instrumentality of the City of Baltimore, instead of the State; providing that police officers of the department have the authority conferred under Title 2 of the Criminal Procedure Article; requiring that a certain "no-knock" search warrant be preapproved by a certain supervisor and the State's Attorney; altering the required frequency of certain police training; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2020
Legislative Date
10/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Law Enforcement Reform
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2020 10/15/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Law Enforcement Reform
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-2, 16-3 )
Last Updated: 1/16/2021 10:50 AM