Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report
Sponsored by
Senators Robinson, Conway, Klausmeier, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Middleton, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to report on the status of the implementation of specified recommendations of the Abuser Registry Workgroup; and requiring the Department to submit a report on the implementation of the recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before September 1, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0279 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {207378/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {207378/1 Adopted 18
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18
Text - Third - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 20
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 23
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM