Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rules of the Road - Duty to Remain at Scene of Accident - Driver Education and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to adopt regulations requiring that classroom instruction for the driver education program include instruction on a specified requirement to remain at the scene of a vehicle accident and the associated penalties; increasing the penalty for failing to remain at the scene of a specified vehicle accident that results in the death of another person; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-505, 20-102, 27-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM