Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Senior Apartment Facilities - Conversion
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Conway, Currie, Madaleno, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a landlord to provide written notice to a specified tenant at least 180 days before converting a senior apartment facility into an apartment facility for the general population; requiring a landlord to allow any tenant who requests to move before the conversion date to terminate the tenant's lease after giving at least 1 month's written notice to the landlord; prohibiting a landlord from withholding any portion of a tenant's security deposit for rent that would have become due under any remaining term of the lease; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {668072/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {190218/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {668072/1 Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 33
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {190218/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2) 64
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM