Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel and Procurement - Service Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Benson, Currie, Guzzone, King, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Ramirez, and Rosapepe
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that specified units meet with the exclusive representative of the employees who may be affected by the service contract to discuss specified alternatives to service contracts under specified circumstances; requiring that specified service contracts be subject to a legislative audit to determine compliance with specified requirements; requiring that the findings of the specified legislative audit be made available to the public; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0158
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {577477/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614863/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-5)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable with Amendments {577477/1 Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 31
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Appropriations 33
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments {614863/1 Report Adopted 57
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-5) 58
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendment 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Passed Enrolled 55
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM