Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Gladden, Kagan, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Pugh, Ramirez, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that exclude from the jurisdiction of the juvenile court a child of a specified age alleged to have committed specified offenses; repealing provisions of law governing the transfer of specified criminal cases to the juvenile court; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0304
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-215, 10-216, 4-202, 4-202.1, 4-202.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM