Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – Park Heights Redevelopment Area – Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsored by
Senator Robinson
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain references to the "Park Heights Redevelopment Area".
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0470
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {534337/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Park Heights Redevelopment Area - Alcoholic Beverages - Store Closing Time
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {534337/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 47
Text - Third - Baltimore City – Park Heights Redevelopment Area – Alcoholic Beverages
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Economic Matters 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-2003, 12-2004 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM