Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container License
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating in the City of Annapolis a refillable container license; authorizing the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board to issue the license to a holder of specified classes of alcoholic beverages licenses; specifying that a holder of the license may sell draft beer for consumption off the licensed premises in a specified refillable container; requiring a refillable container to meet specified requirements; requiring an applicant for the license to complete a specified form and pay a specified fee; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0145
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344036/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {473493/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {344036/1 Report Adopted 28
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 33
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable with Amendments {473493/1 Report Adopted 57
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Passed Enrolled 61A
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM