Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Inheritance Tax - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senators Getty, Brinkley, Colburn, Edwards, Glassman, Hershey, Jacobs, Jennings, Kittleman, Reilly, Shank, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the inheritance tax for decedents dying on or after January 1, 2014; providing that the Comptroller retains specified authority related to the inheritance tax for decedents dying before January 1, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/17/2014 Text - First - Inheritance Tax - Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM