Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act to require the Department of Information Technology to include in a searchable website payments made by units of State government that receive funds that are not appropriated in the annual budget bill; requiring the Department to update the payment data on the searchable website on or before the 15th day of the month that follows the month in which an agency makes a payment to a payee; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0251
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies
Last Updated: 1/19/2021 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page