Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
School Buildings - Solar Technology - Design Development Documents
Sponsored by
Senator Robey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations requiring design development documents for the construction or major renovation of school buildings to include specified information relating to the use of solar technology; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to submit a report on the use of solar technologies in specified public school construction and major renovation projects to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31 of each year; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0103
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1237 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {149534/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-4)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-5)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {149534/1 Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (42-4) 32
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 35
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-5) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM