Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Toll Charges Paid by Chesapeake Bay Bridge or Hatem Bridge Commuters
Sponsored by
Senators Jacobs, Colburn, Glassman, and Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for toll charges paid by an individual for noncommercial travel on the William Preston Lane, Jr. Memorial (Chesapeake Bay) Bridge or Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge during the taxable year under specified circumstances; requiring an individual to submit specified documentation to qualify for the subtraction modification; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0870
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM