Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Anne Arundel Community College Police Force
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a police force for the Anne Arundel Community College; specifying the powers of an Anne Arundel Community College police officer; requiring the Board of Trustees of the Anne Arundel Community College to adopt specified standards and regulations; including a member of the police force of the Anne Arundel Community College in the defined term "police officer" in connection with provisions of law relating to the authority to make arrests; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0552
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-1)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 33
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Judiciary 38
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (130-1) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-407.2 )
(   3-101, 3-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM