Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Maryland Hatch Act
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a State employee may take part in political management or in political campaigns, subject to certain exceptions; prohibiting certain employees of the State Board of Elections or a local board of elections from requesting from, receiving from, or giving to certain individuals a political contribution; prohibiting certain employees of certain government agencies from holding certain leadership positions in a campaign finance entity; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Personnel - Maryland Hatch Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Personnel - Maryland Hatch Act
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Reassigned to Finance 9
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-304, 2-304.1 through 2-304.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM