Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption
Sponsored by
Senators Frosh, Forehand, Gladden, Hershey, Jacobs, Jennings, Shank, and Stone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that, in an action against an owner of a dog for damages for personal injury or death caused by the dog, evidence that the dog caused the injury or death creates a rebuttable presumption that the owner knew or should have known that the dog had vicious or dangerous propensities; prohibiting a judge in a jury trial from making a specified ruling before the jury returns a verdict; establishing that the owner of a dog is liable for injury, death, or loss caused by a dog while the dog is running at large; establishing exceptions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0073
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0160 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {493827/1 Rejected (22-25)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {513321/1 Rejected (23-24)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Motion Reconsider Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {513321/1 (Senator Raskin) Adopted (25-21)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {513321/1 Adopted (25-22)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {493827/1 Rejected (22-25) 34
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {513321/1 Rejected (23-24) 34
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 34
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Raskin) Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Motion Reconsider Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {513321/1 (Senator Raskin) Adopted (25-21) 34
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {513321/1 Adopted (25-22) 34
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 36
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Judiciary 39
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM