Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Notaries Public - Travel Fees
Sponsored by
Senators Norman and Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a notary public to charge a reasonable fee, rather than certain fees established in statute or by regulation of the Secretary of State, as compensation for travel required for the performance of a notarial act; requiring the notary public, before incurring the travel expense, to inform the person requesting the notarial act of the travel fee that will be charged; and requiring the notary public to provide a receipt separately itemizing the travel fee to the person who paid for the notarial act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government - Notaries Public - Travel Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - State Government - Notaries Public - Travel Fees
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM