Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Use of Handgun in Crime of Violence or Felony - Statute of Limitations
Sponsored by
Senators Frosh, Madaleno, and Raskin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the statute of limitations for a violation of a specified provision of law prohibiting using a firearm in the commission of a crime of violence or felony.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0228 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {608672/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Committee Amendment {608672/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment (Judicial Proceedings) {608672/2 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments {608672/1 40
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Committee Amendment {608672/1 Withdrawn 40
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Substitute Committee Amendment (Judicial Proceedings) {608672/2 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 41A
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 First Reading Judiciary 44
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM