Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence - Duties and Membership
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Astle, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Forehand, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, King, Montgomery, Muse, Stone, Glassman, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, and Ramirez
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence to work, in a specified manner, to develop specified strategies to enable organizations that adopt telemedicine to practice safe security techniques to minimize successful cyber attacks; requiring that members of the Commission reasonably reflect the geographic, racial, ethnic, cultural, and gender diversity of the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0808
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0494 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {707573/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments {707573/1 Report Adopted 31
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 33
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 36
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM