Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a qualified farm a credit, for tax years 2016 through 2018, of up to $5,000 against the State income tax; providing that the credit is equal to 50% of the value of an eligible food donation or 75% of the value of donated certified organic produce; providing that the total amount of tax credit certificates issued may not exceed $250,000 per fiscal year; reestablishing the Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland Region and including Montgomery County in the Task Force; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Emergency Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0280 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {539733/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {539733/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 43
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 72
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM