Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Frederick County - Frederick Alliance For Youth - Youth and Community Center
Sponsored by
Senators Brinkley and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 to alter the grantee and purpose of a grant originally for the Frederick Alliance For Youth - Youth and Community Center to allow the grant to be used for the Mental Health Association Building; extending to June 1, 2015, the deadline for the grantee to present evidence of a matching fund and to encumber funds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0076
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
NOTE: Prior authorizations that were altered during the 2013 Session were amended into the Omnibus Bill (HB 1372). Individual prior authorizations were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 1372 to alter prior authorizations.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM