Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County Public Schools - Capital Project Scoring System
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore County Board of Education, on or before January 1, 2020, to develop and implement a scoring system to prioritize school buildings that are more than 50 years old and have not been improved by major renovation in 15 years and, on or before January 1, 2022, to apply the scoring system to 75% of public school facilities, publish project scores on the school system's website, and report project scores to the Baltimore County delegation to the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County Public Schools - Capital Project Scoring System
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore County Public Schools - Capital Project Scoring System
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 14
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-135 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM