Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Required Regulations - Liquidated Damages Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring regulations adopted by the Board of Public Works to prohibit a unit from assessing liquidated damages for certain contracts for which a certain minority business enterprise was named on a participation schedule or named on a participation schedule and qualified based on a certain code; and providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0858
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Minority Business Enterprises - Required Regulations - Liquidated Damages Prohibition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable Adopted 20
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Second Reading Passed 20
Text - Third - Minority Business Enterprises - Required Regulations - Liquidated Damages Prohibition
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 23
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Text - Chapter - Minority Business Enterprises - Required Regulations - Liquidated Damages Prohibition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM