Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Madaleno, Pinsky, Bates, Kagan, Nathan-Pulliam, Robinson, Salling, Simonaire, Waugh, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a provision that provides for the termination of a prohibition on selling alcoholic beverages that are sold in a powder or crystalline form for direct use or use in combination with water or any other substance.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0213
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614334/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-2)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-26)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {614334/1 Adopted 36
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-2) 38
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Referred Economic Matters 39
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51
House 3/22/2018 3/18/2018 Third Reading Passed (109-26) 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM