Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards - Adoption
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to adopt by regulation the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code as the Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards; requiring the Department to adopt each subsequent version of the Standards within 18 months after the version is issued; requiring the Department to take certain actions before adopting each version of the Standards; prohibiting the Department from adopting a modification of the Standards that is more stringent than certain requirements; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0109
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/10/2020
Legislative Date
9/10/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards - Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/10/2020 9/10/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards - Adoption
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1201 through 12-1207 )
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 12:24 PM