Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - License Renewal
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Benson, Ferguson, Forehand, Jacobs, Klausmeier, Peters, and Pinsky
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the time period before a license expires by which the Board of Examiners of Psychologists is required to send a renewal notice to a licensee; requiring the Board, under specified circumstances, to send a renewal notice by electronic means to a specified electronic mail address of a licensee; requiring each licensee to notify the Board in writing of any change in address or electronic mail address within 30 days after the change occurs; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0098
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 26
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Second Reading Passed 26
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 28
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 31
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM