Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Access to Pharmacy Services in Maryland
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Astle, Feldman, Glassman, Kittleman, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, Ramirez, and Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Access to Pharmacy Services in Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to specified individuals, committees, and the Health Services Cost Review Commission on or before December 31, 2014; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {387571/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {226887/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {923621/1 Rejected (35-100)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {387571/1 Report Adopted 23
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 28
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments {226887/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {923621/1 Rejected (35-100) 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM