Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Conway, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Incorporating by reference specified nutrient management plan requirements in the Maryland Nutrient Management Manual of the Department of Agriculture and any supplements to the Manual; establishing specified content and criteria for a nutrient management plan developed for an agricultural operation; providing that a specified agricultural certification does not prevent the application or enforcement of specified provisions of law; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0381
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {324534/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {324534/1 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 45
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Favorable with Amendments 49
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky) 49
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-1006, 8-801, 8-808, 8-808.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM