Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Montgomery, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Climate Change in the Department of the Environment to advise the Governor and General Assembly on ways to mitigate the causes of, prepare for, and adapt to the consequences of climate change; establishing the membership of the Commission; requiring the Commission to establish specified working groups; requiring the commission members and working group members to be appointed and the Commission to be convened on or before July 1, 2016; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0514
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744036/1
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744036/1
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Bates) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {563828/1 Rejected (14-33)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {563623/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {723427/1 Rejected (21-25)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {563120/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Bates) {103125/1 Rejected (14-33)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {230812/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (98-42)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {744036/1 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 34
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {744036/1 35
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 35
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Bates) Adopted 35
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {563828/1 Rejected (14-33) 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {563623/1 Adopted 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {723427/1 Rejected (21-25) 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {563120/1 Adopted 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Bates) {103125/1 Rejected (14-33) 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 39
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 41
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments {230812/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (98-42) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendment 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1301 through 2-1306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM