Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company Employees
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings, Brochin, Klausmeier, and Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of State Police to accept a background investigation performed on behalf of specified armored car companies in place of a specified criminal history records check performed by the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0189
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0283 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {698278/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {412019/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Senators Muse, Lee, and Hough
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {698278/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Judiciary 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {412019/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Senate Requests House Recede 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Senators Muse, Lee, and Hough 64
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM