Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Sponsored by
Senators West and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Clarifying that the charter or bylaws of a corporation may require that any internal corporate claim be brought only in certain specified courts; repealing the authority of certain corporations to effect a certain reverse stock split; altering the manner in which a corporation may allow stockholders to participate in a certain meeting; authorizing a certain meeting of the stockholders to be held partially or solely by means of remote communication; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 12:24 PM