Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Public School Buses - Exemption From Tolls
Sponsored by
Senators King, Feldman, Kagan, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority, beginning on or before January 1, 2020, to exempt school buses owned and operated by county boards of education from tolls, fees, or any other charges for the use of transportation facilities projects; requiring the Authority to renegotiate the trust agreement with its bondholders to allow a school bus owned and operated by a county board of education to use a transportation facilities project without paying a toll, a fee, or any other charge; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0259
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority - Public School Buses - Exemption From Tolls
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-153, 11-154, 11-173, 4-101, 4-312 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM